legal
Differences
This shows you the differences between two versions of the page.
Both sides previous revisionPrevious revisionNext revision | Previous revisionNext revisionBoth sides next revision | ||
legal [2018/10/17 00:36] – new organs mrkva | legal [2020/06/23 20:38] – [Brmlab Organs] mrkva | ||
---|---|---|---|
Line 23: | Line 23: | ||
The **Council (Rada)** is the executive body and can be reached at {{rada-email.png}} | The **Council (Rada)** is the executive body and can be reached at {{rada-email.png}} | ||
- | * [[user:Jenda|Jan Hrach]] | + | * [[user:niekt0|Ivor Kollar]] |
- | * [[user:barney|Blanka Laudová]] | + | * [[user:malanius|Michal Slota]] |
- | * [[user:lairen|Lucie Matoušková]] | + | * [[user:sumie-dh|Karolína Plšková]] |
- | * [[user:pinky|Jiří Pinkava]] | + | * [[user:abyssal|Ondřej Mikle]] |
* [[user: | * [[user: | ||
Line 38: | Line 38: | ||
The **Grant committee (GK)** | The **Grant committee (GK)** | ||
- | * [[user:dan|Daniel Handl]] | + | * [[user:tma|Miroslav Tichý]] |
* [[user: | * [[user: | ||
- | * [[user:tomsuch|Tomáš Suchan]] | + | * [[user:martyet|Martin Myška]] |
**Spokesperson (tiskový mluvčí)** | **Spokesperson (tiskový mluvčí)** | ||
- | | + | * Official press releases are only valid, if signed and published by spokesperson. Anything |
- | | + | |
- | The current members have been elected at valná hromada on Oct 16 2018. | + | The current members have been elected at valná hromada on Jan 07 2020. |
===== Former chairmen (hall of fame) ===== | ===== Former chairmen (hall of fame) ===== | ||
legal.txt · Last modified: 2024/02/13 17:07 by niekt0